Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Clifford Timlin

Bishop Emeritus of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1927 Born
16 Jul 195123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
26 Jul 197648.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
26 Jul 197648.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gunugus
21 Sep 197649.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gunugus
24 Apr 198456.7AppointedBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
25 Jul 200375.9RetiredBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for James Clifford Timlin
Bishop James Clifford Timlin (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Scranton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScranton, Diocese of Scranton, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopCathedral, Scranton, Diocese of Scranton, Pennsylvania

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Scranton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 37, Number 2,258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast