Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Theurillat

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland

Titular Bishop of Tubulbaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1950 Born
16 May 197625.6Ordained PriestPriest of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland
17 Apr 200049.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland
17 Apr 200049.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubulbaca
22 Jun 200049.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubulbaca
8 Feb 202170.3ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Denis Theurillat
Bishop Denis Theurillat (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEpauvillers
Ordained BishopSaint-Ours et Saint-Victor, Cathedral, Soleure

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,789
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Feb 2021

Quantcast