Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pēteris Strods

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Riga, Latvia

Titular Bishop of Stadia

Apostolic Administrator of Liepāja


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1892Born
26 May 191624.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 194654.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Riga, Latvia
19 Jul 194654.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Liepāja, Latvia
19 Jul 194654.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Stadia
25 Jul 194755.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Stadia
1 Oct 195866.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Riga, Latvia
5 Aug 196068.2DiedApostolic Administrator of Riga, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Pēteris Strods
Bishop Pēteris Strods (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Riga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVaraklani

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,905
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1947, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast