Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Gaspar Stork, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of San José de Costa Rica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1856Born
1 Jun 190447.9AppointedBishop of San José de Costa Rica
28 Aug 190448.2Ordained BishopBishop of San José de Costa Rica
12 Dec 192064.5DiedBishop of San José de Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Juan Gaspar Stork
Bishop Juan Gaspar Stork C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of San José de Costa Rica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKöln, Germany

  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1904, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast