Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Steffani

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover, Northern Germany), Germany

Titular Bishop of Spiga(z) (or Pegae)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1654Born
168025.4Ordained PriestPriest of Freising, Germany
13 Sep 170652.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Spiga(z) (or Pegae)
2 Jan 170752.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Spiga(z) (or Pegae)
6 Apr 170954.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover, Northern Germany), Germany
172368.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover, Northern Germany), Germany
27 May 172671.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover, Northern Germany), Germany
12 Feb 172873.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover, Northern Germany), Germany

MicroData Summary for Agostino Steffani
Bishop Agostino Steffani (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover, Northern Germany)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelfranco Veneto
Ordained BishopBamberg, Diocese of Bamberg

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1707
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 361
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1707, Number 3
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,631

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast