Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walterus Staal, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Batavia, Indonesia

Titular Bishop of Mauricastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1839Born
1 Sep 187232.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
23 May 189353.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Batavia, Indonesia
23 May 189353.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Mauricastro
12 Nov 189354.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mauricastro
30 Jan 189757.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Batavia, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Walterus Staal
Bishop Walterus Staal S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Batavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVelp, Archdiocese of Utrecht, Netherlands
Ordained BishopKuilenberg
Death PlaceAt Sea

  • a priest for 24.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 373
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 63
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast