Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Josip Srebrnić

Deceased

Bishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

Note/Previous Titular See: (AA of the Slovenian and Croatian portions)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1876Born
28 Oct 190630.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Sep 192347.6AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
8 Dec 192347.8Ordained BishopBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
Nov 1949³73.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rijeka (-Opatija), Croatia
21 Apr 195175.2CeasedApostolic Administrator of Rijeka (-Opatija), Croatia
2 Mar 196387.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
21 Jun 196690.3DiedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josip Srebrnić
Archbishop Josip Srebrnić (born , died ) Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSolkan

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1923, Number 70
  • aadm: CB, 29 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 30 Nov 2020

Quantcast