Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Spinucci

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1739Born
19 Mar 176324.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Apr 177536.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Targa
17 Apr 177536.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Targa
12 May 177738.1AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
27 Jun 179657.3AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
8 Mar 181677.0Elevated to Cardinal
29 Apr 181677.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
21 Dec 182384.8DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Spinucci (VIAF: 89058915)
Domenico Cardinal Spinucci (born , died ) Archbishop of Benevento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFermo, Archdiocese of Fermo
Ordained BishopFermo, Archdiocese of Fermo

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 48.6 years
  • a cardinal for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Mar 1816
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 8
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,650

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast