Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Júlio César Souza de Jesus

Auxiliary Bishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Arba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1971 Born
27 Jun 199827.3Ordained PriestPriest of Teresina, Piaui, Brazil
11 Jul 201847.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
11 Jul 201847.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Arba
30 Sep 201847.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arba

MicroData Summary for Júlio César Souza de Jesus
Bishop Júlio César Souza de Jesus (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Fortaleza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGoiânia, Archdiocese of Goiânia, Goias
Ordained BishopIn front of, Nossa Senhora dos Dores, Cathedral, Teresina, Archdiocese of Teresina, Piaui

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Fortaleza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2018
  • ob: CB, 11 Jul 2018
  • c2+: CB, 26 Sep 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,863
  • bd: CB, 25 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast