Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nasrallah Boutros Cardinal Sfeir

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Priest of Damas (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1920Born
7 May 195029.9Ordained PriestPriest of Damas (Maronite), Syria
19 Jun 196141.0SelectedPatriarchal Vicar
23 Jun 196141.1ConfirmedPatriarchal Vicar
23 Jun 196141.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti
16 Jul 196141.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti
19 Apr 198665.9SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
7 May 198665.9ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
26 Nov 199474.5Elevated to Cardinal
26 Feb 201190.7ResignedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
12 May 201998.9DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Nasrallah Boutros Sfeir
(VIAF: 64045930; WikiData: Q462331)
Nasrallah Boutros Cardinal Sfeir (born , died ) Patriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReyfoun
Ordained BishopBkerké
Death PlaceHotel Dieu, Hospital, Beirut
Buried Place (Original)Maronite, Church, Bkerké

  • a priest for 69.0 years
  • a bishop for 57.8 years
  • a cardinal for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Feb 2011
  • d: CB, 12 May 2019
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1994
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1961, Number 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 20 Dec 2023