Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Youssef Mohsen Béchara

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Antélias (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1935Born
19 Apr 196328.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Apr 198651.0AppointedArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
18 May 198651.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
11 Jun 198853.2AppointedArchbishop of Antélias (Maronite), Lebanon
16 Jun 201277.2RetiredArchbishop of Antélias (Maronite), Lebanon
9 Jun 202085.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Antélias (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Youssef Mohsen Béchara
Archbishop Youssef Mohsen Béchara (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Antélias

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArbet-Kozhaya
Ordained BishopBkerke
Death Place

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,235
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 9 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast