Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Boulos Boutros Mass’ad (Massaad)

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1806Born
13 Jun 183024.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 184135.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tarsus
12 Nov 185448.7SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
23 Mar 185549.1ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
18 Apr 189084.1DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Boulos Boutros Mass’ad (Massaad) (VIAF: 311789694)
Patriarch Boulos Boutros Mass’ad (Massaad) (born , died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAskut, Mont Liban
Ordained BishopBkerké

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 49.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 108
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1841, Number 13
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,365

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast