Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Boutros Edmond Gemayel

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cipro (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1932Born
12 Apr 195926.7Ordained PriestPriest of Cipro (Maronite)
11 Jun 198855.9AppointedArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite)
11 Sep 198856.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite)
6 Jun 200875.9RetiredArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite)
21 Aug 202189.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cipro (Maronite)

MicroData Summary for Boutros Edmond Gemayel
Archbishop Boutros Edmond Gemayel (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cipro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAin El-Kharroubé, Lebanon
Ordained BishopPatriarchal, Church, Bkerké
Death PlaceLebanon

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,450
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,954
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 175
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 21 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Aug 2021

Quantcast