Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Mahfouz, O.L.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Líbano em São Paulo (Maronite), Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1932Born
29 Jun 196028.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Lebanese Maronite (Maronite)
9 Jun 199058.3AppointedBishop of Nossa Senhora do Líbano em São Paulo (Maronite), Brazil
12 Aug 199058.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nossa Senhora do Líbano em São Paulo (Maronite), Brazil
14 Oct 200674.6ResignedBishop of Nossa Senhora do Líbano em São Paulo (Maronite), Brazil
25 Aug 201078.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Líbano em São Paulo (Maronite), Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mahfouz (VIAF: 5248636)
Bishop Joseph Mahfouz O.L.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Líbano em São Paulo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGhadir

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Oct 2006
  • d: JPG
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,381
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022