Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Henri Cardinal Schwery

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Protomartiri a Via Aurelia Antica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1932Born
7 Jul 195725.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
22 Jul 197745.1AppointedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
17 Sep 197745.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
28 Jun 199159.0Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 199159.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Protomartiri a Via Aurelia Antica
1 Apr 199562.7ResignedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
7 Jan 202188.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Henri Schwery
Henri Cardinal Schwery (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sion {Sitten}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Léonard
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Sion, Diocese of Sion {Sitten}
Death PlaceHome Le Carillon, Saint-Léonard

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.3 years
  • a cardinal for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 3,022
  • d: CB, 7 Jan 2021
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 247, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Sep 2021

Quantcast