Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerhard Schneider

Auxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany

Titular Bishop of Abbir Germaniciana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1969 Born
6 Jul 200233.4Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany
16 Apr 201950.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany
16 Apr 201950.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Abbir Germaniciana
13 Jul 201950.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abbir Germaniciana

MicroData Summary for Gerhard Schneider
Bishop Gerhard Schneider (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg-Stuttgart

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUlm, Diocese of Rottenburg
Ordained BishopSankt Eberhard, Co-Cathedral, Stuttgart, Diocese of Rottenburg-Stuttgart

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rottenburg-Stuttgart.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2019
  • ob: CB, 16 Apr 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 3 May 2019
  • c34: CB, 9 Jun 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,211

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast