Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan a Santa Cruz, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1645¹Born
24 Sep 166621.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
3 Apr 171671.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
3 Apr 171671.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)
13 Aug 171974.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)
14 Aug 172176.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan a Santa Cruz
Bishop Juan a Santa Cruz O.P. (born 1645, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Martín de Valvení, Spain
Ordained BishopTuinglinh

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 36, Number 122
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 221
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,853
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 34, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast