Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Müllener, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China

Titular Bishop of Myriophytos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1673Born
16 Dec 169623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
2 Sep 171541.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China
2 Sep 171541.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Myriophytos
14 Dec 171643.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myriophytos
17 Dec 174269.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China

MicroData Summary for Johannes Müllener
Bishop Johannes Müllener C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBremen, Diocese of Osnabrück, Germany
Ordained BishopChangtong
Death PlaceXintouxian

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 278
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 31
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast