Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Maximos IV Cardinal Saigh, S.M.S.P. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

Bishop of Damas (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1878Born
17 Sep 190527.4Ordained PriestPriest of Società dei Missionari di San Paolo (Melkite Greek)
30 Aug 191941.3AppointedArchbishop of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
30 Aug 191941.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
30 Aug 193355.3AppointedArchbishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
30 Oct 194769.5SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
30 Oct 194769.5SelectedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
21 Jun 194870.1ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
21 Jun 194870.1ConfirmedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
22 Feb 196586.8Elevated to Cardinal
5 Nov 196789.5DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Maximos IV Saigh (VIAF: 37987331)
Maximos IV Cardinal Saigh S.M.S.P. (born , died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep
Ordained BishopMelkite, Cathedral, Damas, Archdiocese of Damas (Melkite Greek)

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 48.1 years
  • a cardinal for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1919, Number 51
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,782

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast