Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agapios Salomon Naoum, B.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Titular Archbishop of Tarsus dei Greco-Melkiti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1882Born
8 Sep 190725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
3 Nov 193351.2SelectedArchbishop of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
3 Dec 193351.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
21 Dec 193351.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
15 Oct 196583.2RetiredArchbishop of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
15 Oct 196583.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus dei Greco-Melkiti
1 May 196784.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Agapios Salomon Naoum
Archbishop Agapios Salomon Naoum B.S. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tyr

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWadi Deir El Kamar
Ordained BishopCathedral, Beirut, Archdiocese of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek)

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1933, Number 86
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,791

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast