Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Néophytos Edelby, B.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1920Born
20 Jul 194423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
5 Dec 196141.0SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
24 Dec 196141.1ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
24 Dec 196141.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in Osrhoëne dei Greco-Melkiti
25 Feb 196241.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Edessa in Osrhoëne dei Greco-Melkiti
6 Mar 196847.3AppointedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria
10 Jun 199574.5DiedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Néophytos Edelby (VIAF: 824516)
Archbishop Néophytos Edelby B.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep
Ordained BishopBeirut, Archdiocese of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 17
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 47, Number 3,242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast