Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Moritz Adolf Karl von Sachsen-Zeitz (Saský)

Deceased

Bishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1702Born
22 Mar 171613.3Converted
172522.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nordic Missions, Germany
8 Feb 173027.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Pharsalus
27 Aug 173027.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pharsalus
8 Oct 173128.8SelectedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
3 Mar 173229.2ConfirmedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
4 Jul 173330.5SelectedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
1 Oct 173330.8ConfirmedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
7 Dec 173331.0InstalledBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
20 Jun 175956.5DiedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Moritz Adolf Karl von Sachsen-Zeitz (Saský)
Bishop Moritz Adolf Karl von Sachsen-Zeitz (Saský) (born , died ) Bishop of Litoměřice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeustadt/Orla
Ordained BishopCathedral, Praha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 313
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 264, and Page 355
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,080

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast