Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Inocencio Rodríguez Díez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cuenca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1891Born
17 Jun 191624.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 194351.9AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
19 Sep 194352.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Spain
13 Apr 197381.8RetiredBishop of Cuenca, Spain
22 Oct 197483.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Inocencio Rodríguez Díez
Bishop Inocencio Rodríguez Díez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cuenca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Olaja de la Varga

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1943, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast