Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo Rocconi

Bishop of Jesi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1949 Born
15 Sep 197323.8Ordained PriestPriest of Senigallia, Italy
20 Mar 200656.3AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
29 Apr 200656.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jesi, Italy
13 May 200656.4InstalledBishop of Jesi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Rocconi
Bishop Gerardo Rocconi (born ) Bishop of Jesi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorinaldo, Diocese of Senigallia
Ordained PriestCorinaldo, Diocese of Senigallia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Senigallia, Diocese of Senigallia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jesi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,147
  • loc: AM, 1 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast