Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Josif Printezis

Archbishop-Elect of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos, Greece

Apostolic Administrator of Chios (Scio)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1970 Born
15 Jul 199525.4Ordained PriestPriest of Syros (e Milos), Greece
25 Jan 202150.9AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos, Greece
25 Jan 202150.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Chios (Scio), Greece
10 Mar 202151.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos, Greece

MicroData Summary for Josif Printezis
Father Josif Printezis (born ) Archbishop-Elect of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoseidonia, Diocese of Syros (e Milos)
Ordained BishopPanagia Rodari, Cathedral, Xinara, Tinos, Archdiocese of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2021
  • ob: CB, 25 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 25 Jan 2021

Quantcast