Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Połubiński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Titular Bishop of Loryma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1735³Born
8 Jun 176025.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 179661.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
27 Jun 179661.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Loryma
Aug 1798³63.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Loryma
1801¹65.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georges Połubiński
Bishop Georges Połubiński (born , died 1801) Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKossowien
Ordained BishopVilnius, Diocese of Vilnius

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 265, and Page 454
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 36
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,712

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast