Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tomás de Portes e Infante

Deceased

Archbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1778¹Born
20 Jan 184870.0AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
12 Nov 184870.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
8 Apr 185880.2DiedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomás de Portes e Infante
Archbishop Tomás de Portes e Infante (born 1778, died ) Archbishop of Santo Domingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanto Domingo, Archdiocese of Santo Domingo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santo Domingo, Archdiocese of Santo Domingo

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 248
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 61
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,404
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast