Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Manoel Pereira Ribeiro

Deceased

Bishop of Funchal, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1879Born
13 Oct 190122.6Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 191435.6AppointedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
7 Feb 191535.9Ordained BishopBishop of Funchal, Portugal
22 Mar 195778.0DiedBishop of Funchal, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Antônio Manoel Pereira Ribeiro
Bishop Antônio Manoel Pereira Ribeiro (born , died ) Bishop of Funchal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFriande

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1915, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast