Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Décimo Pellegrini, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Cuevo, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Tatilti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1918Born
6 Jul 194123.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
18 Dec 197254.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cuevo, Bolivia
18 Dec 197254.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tatilti
8 Apr 197355.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tatilti
31 Oct 199274.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Cuevo, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Décimo Pellegrini
Bishop Giovanni Décimo Pellegrini O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Cuevo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUzzano
Ordained BishopS. Cruz de la Sierra, Camiri

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,169
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,800
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 43, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast