Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Siby Mathew Peedikayil, H.G.N.

Bishop of Aitape, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1970 Born
3 Jul 198615.5ProfessedMember of Heralds of Good News
1 Feb 199524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Heralds of Good News
13 May 202150.4AppointedBishop of Aitape, Papua New Guinea
26 Sep 202150.8Ordained BishopBishop of Aitape, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Siby Mathew Peedikayil
Bishop Siby Mathew Peedikayil H.G.N. (born ) Bishop of Aitape

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMeloram, Kerala, India
Ordained BishopNear, St. Ignatius, Cathedral, Aitape, Diocese of Aitape

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aitape.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 May 2021
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Sep 2021
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 249, Number 20,762

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Oct 2021

Quantcast