Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Henry Ottenweller

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Steubenville, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1916Born
19 Jun 194327.2Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA
17 Apr 197458.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA
17 Apr 197458.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Perdices
29 May 197458.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Perdices
27 Sep 197761.4AppointedBishop of Steubenville, Ohio, USA
22 Nov 197761.6InstalledBishop of Steubenville, Ohio, USA
28 Jan 199275.8RetiredBishop of Steubenville, Ohio, USA
23 Sep 201296.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Steubenville, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Albert Henry Ottenweller
Bishop Albert Henry Ottenweller (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Steubenville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStanford, MT
Ordained BishopOur Lady, Queen of the Most Holy Rosary, Cathedral, Toledo, Diocese of Toledo (in America), Ohio

  • a priest for 69.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 24 Sep 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,701

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast