Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Dillon

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1758¹Born
5 Jan 179638.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Raphoe, Ireland
5 Jan 179638.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
22 May 179638.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
30 Aug 180042.6AppointedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
19 Apr 180648.2DiedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Dillon
Bishop James Dillon (born 1758, died ) Bishop of Kilmore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArchdiocese of Armagh

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 311, and Page 352
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 228
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 30
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast