Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick MacMullan

Deceased

Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1752Born
1775¹22.7Ordained PriestPriest of Down and Connor, Ireland
19 Jul 179341.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
19 Jul 179341.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ramata (Rama)
21 Sep 179341.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ramata (Rama)
8 Oct 179442.5SucceededBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
25 Oct 182472.6DiedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick MacMullan
Bishop Patrick MacMullan (born , died ) Bishop of Down and Connor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeavaghan
Ordained PriestSeaforde
Ordained BishopOld Chapel, Newry
Buried Place (Original)Family vault, Island, Loughinisland lake

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 202, and Page 352
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 77
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,390

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast