Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Cruise

Deceased

Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland

Administrator of Clonmacnoise


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1750²Born
10 Jun 178838.4AppointedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
10 Jun 178838.4AppointedAdministrator of Clonmacnoise, Ireland
17 Aug 178838.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
28 Jun 181262.4DiedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Cruise
Bishop John Cruise (born 1750, died ) Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopDrogheda

  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 97, and Page 171
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 14
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,689

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast