Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James O’Gallagher

Deceased

Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1684¹Born
7 Jul 172541.5SelectedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
21 Jul 172541.5ConfirmedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
25 Nov 172541.8Ordained BishopBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
21 Apr 173753.3SelectedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
18 May 173753.3ConfirmedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
May 1751³67.3DiedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James O’Gallagher (VIAF: 315938641)
Bishop James O’Gallagher (born 1684, died May 1751) Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiocese of Kilmore
Ordained BishopDrogheda

  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 327
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 248
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 45
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,065
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast