Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernard MacMahon (McMahon)

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Administrator of Dromore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1680¹Born
1 Feb 170525.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Mar 170525.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Aug 172646.6SelectedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
7 Apr 172747.2ConfirmedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
6 Nov 173757.8SelectedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
8 Nov 173757.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
8 Nov 173757.8AppointedAdministrator of Dromore, Ireland
27 May 174767.4DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard MacMahon (McMahon)
Archbishop Bernard MacMahon (McMahon) (born 1680, died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEnagh, Co. Monaghan
Buried Place (Original)Churchyard, Edergole, Co. Monaghan

  • a priest for 42.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 100
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 162
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 63
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast