Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hugh MacMahon (McMahon)

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1660²Born
11 Feb 168626.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Mar 168626.1Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 170747.2AppointedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
8 Nov 170747.8Ordained BishopBishop of Clogher, Ireland
22 Aug 171151.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kilmore, Ireland
5 Jul 171555.5AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
2 Dec 172868.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Kilmore, Ireland
2 Aug 173777.5DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hugh MacMahon (McMahon)
Archbishop Hugh MacMahon (McMahon) (born 1660, died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCavany, Co. Monaghan
Ordained BishopSt. Omer
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter's churchyard, Drogheda

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,460
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 99, and Page 162
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 232
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 27
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 74
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,277

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast