Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Alberto Nicolini

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Salto, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1941Born
15 Aug 196423.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 Oct 197736.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salto, Uruguay
28 Oct 197736.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lilybaeum
8 Dec 197736.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lilybaeum
29 Dec 198443.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Salto, Uruguay
19 Jun 198847.3DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Salto, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Carlos Alberto Nicolini
Bishop Carlos Alberto Nicolini (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Salto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontevideo, Archdiocese of Montevideo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salto, Diocese of Salto

  • a priest for 23.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast