Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás Eugenio Navarro

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Titular Archbishop of Carpathus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1867Born
29 Sep 189022.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 Feb 194375.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
9 Feb 194375.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Usula
25 Mar 194375.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Usula
23 Apr 195284.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Carpathus
6 Nov 196092.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Eugenio Navarro
Bishop Nicolás Eugenio Navarro (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIsola Margherita

  • a priest for 70.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1943, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast