Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Francis Murphy

Deceased

Bishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1885Born
13 Jun 190823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
17 Mar 193852.8AppointedBishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA
17 May 193853.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA
7 Feb 195064.7DiedBishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for William Francis Murphy
Bishop William Francis Murphy (born , died ) Bishop of Saginaw

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalamazoo

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1938, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast