Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Alonso Muñoyerro

Deceased

Archbishop of Spain, Military

Titular Archbishop of Sion


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1888Born
21 Dec 191224.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 194455.5AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
23 Jul 194455.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
12 Dec 195062.3AppointedArchbishop of Spain, Military
12 Dec 195062.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sion
23 Sep 196880.0DiedArchbishop of Spain, Military

MicroData Summary for Luis Alonso Muñoyerro
Archbishop Luis Alonso Muñoyerro (born , died ) Archbishop of Spain, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrillo
Ordained BishopSt Francisco el Grande, Madrid, Diocese of Madrid

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1944, Number 34
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 28, Number 1,580

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast