Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pacifico Monza, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Troas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1845Born
23 Oct 191166.7AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor
20 Aug 191570.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
8 Sep 191570.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troas
18 Dec 191772.8DiedTitular Bishop of Troas

MicroData Summary for Pacifico Monza (VIAF: 31140417)
Bishop Pacifico Monza O.F.M. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Troas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVicenza, Diocese of Vicenza, Italy

  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1915, Number 54
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 377

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast