Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Mola

Deceased

Bishop of Bergamo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1755Born
10 Jan 177923.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jun 182064.4SelectedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
8 Jan 182165.0ConfirmedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
8 Apr 182165.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bergamo, Italy
16 Jan 182973.0DiedBishop of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Mola
Bishop Pietro Mola (born , died ) Bishop of Bergamo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCodogno
Ordained BishopCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1822
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 110
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1821, Number 6
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast