Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Guido Menna

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mantova, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Novae Patrae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1875Born
14 Aug 189822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Brescia, Italy
16 Nov 192853.0AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
6 Jan 192953.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mantova, Italy
29 May 192953.5InstalledBishop of Mantova, Italy
8 Sep 195478.8RetiredBishop of Mantova, Italy
8 Sep 195478.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Novae Patrae
8 Oct 195781.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Mantova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Guido Menna
Archbishop Domenico Guido Menna (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mantova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChiari, Diocese of Brescia
Ordained BishopSanti Faustino e Giovita, Church, Chiari, Diocese of Brescia
Death PlaceCamaldolese hermitage, Gussago, Diocese of Brescia

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1929, Number 1
  • c1/opd/loc/mn: CB, 11 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Apr 2021

Quantcast