Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Bonaventura Medori

Deceased

Bishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1895Born
9 Jul 192226.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 194549.6AppointedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
30 Sep 194549.8Ordained BishopBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
12 Aug 195054.7DiedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Bonaventura Medori
Bishop Vincenzo Bonaventura Medori (born , died ) Bishop of Calvi e Teano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagnoreggio

  • a priest for 28.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1945, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast