Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William John McNaughton, M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Incheon {Inch’on}, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1926Born
13 Jun 195326.5Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
6 Jun 196134.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Inch’on, Korea (South)
6 Jun 196134.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuburbo Minus
24 Aug 196134.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thuburbo Minus
10 Mar 196235.2AppointedBishop of Incheon {Inch’on}, Korea (South)
25 Apr 200275.3RetiredBishop of Incheon {Inch’on}, Korea (South)
3 Feb 202093.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Incheon {Inch’on}, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for William John McNaughton (VIAF: 316740141)
Bishop William John McNaughton M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Incheon {Inch’on}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLawrence, MA, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
Death PlaceMethuen, MA, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
Buried Place (Original)St. Patrick, Cemetery, Lowell, MA, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

  • a priest for 66.6 years
  • a bishop for 58.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: CB, 4 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast