Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Mchamungu

Auxiliary Bishop of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania

Titular Bishop of Tanaramusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1965 Born
24 Jun 199429.4Ordained PriestPriest of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania
7 Jul 202156.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania
7 Jul 202156.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanaramusa
21 Sep 202156.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanaramusa

MicroData Summary for Henry Mchamungu
Bishop Henry Mchamungu (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Dar-es-Salaam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLegho Kilema, Diocese of Moshi
Ordained BishopGrounds of, Msimbazi Centre, Dar-es-Salaam, Archdiocese of Dar-es-Salaam

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Dar-es-Salaam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 Sep 2021
  • c34: CB, 21 Sep 2021
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 249, Number 20,757

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Oct 2021

Quantcast