Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Fabian McCarthy

Bishop of Rockhampton, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1950 Born
19 Nov 197727.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Brisbane, Australia
19 Aug 197827.9Ordained PriestPriest of Brisbane, Australia
10 Mar 201463.4AppointedBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
29 May 201463.7Ordained BishopBishop of Rockhampton, Australia

MicroData Summary for Michael Fabian McCarthy
Bishop Michael Fabian McCarthy (born ) Bishop of Rockhampton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToowoomba
Ordained DeaconSt. Michael's, Church, Daceyville
Ordained PriestSt. Stephen's, Cathedral, Brisbane, Archdiocese of Brisbane
Ordained BishopSaint Joseph, Cathedral, Rockhampton, Diocese of Rockhampton

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rockhampton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Mar 2014
  • ob: CB, 16 Mar 2014
  • c2+: CB, 25 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,170

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast