Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mario Cardinal Mattei

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Pro-Datary of the Apostolic Datary

Prefect of the Congregation of the Reverend Fabric of St. Peter

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1792Born
1817¹24.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 183239.8Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 183240.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
1841²48.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Sacred Consulta
22 Jul 184249.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
11 Mar 184350.5AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
11 Mar 184350.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Reverend Fabric of St. Peter
17 Jun 184451.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
23 Jun 184451.7Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
1847²54.3ResignedPrefect of the Congregation of the Sacred Consulta
23 Jun 185461.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
4 Jul 185461.8AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
3 Feb 185865.4AppointedPro-Datary of the Apostolic Datary
17 Dec 186068.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
7 Oct 187078.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mario Mattei (VIAF: 89063919)
Mario Cardinal Mattei (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePergola, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)San Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
  • a cardinal for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 44
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 39
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Jul 1832

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast