Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Loyola Ivan Mascarenhas

Bishop of Simla and Chandigarh, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1949 Born
17 Dec 197728.5Ordained PriestPriest of Delhi, India
10 Feb 200959.6AppointedBishop of Simla and Chandigarh, India
3 Apr 200959.8Ordained BishopBishop of Simla and Chandigarh, India

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Loyola Ivan Mascarenhas
Bishop Ignatius Loyola Ivan Mascarenhas (born ) Bishop of Simla and Chandigarh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDelhi, Archdiocese of Delhi
Ordained BishopGrounds of, Sacred Heart School, Chandigarh, Diocese of Simla and Chandigarh

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Simla and Chandigarh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,149

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast